NJ A5531 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain commercial fishermen from coverage under "unemployment compensation law."
Title
Exempts certain commercial fishermen from coverage under "unemployment compensation law."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3501 |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3501 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.346.