NJ S3501 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain commercial fishermen from coverage under "unemployment compensation law."
Title
Exempts certain commercial fishermen from coverage under "unemployment compensation law."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5531 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5531 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.346. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A5531 |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5531 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3501