NJ A611 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4590
Note: Carry Over of previous S2849
Note: Carry Over of previous S2849
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Seeing Eye® dog as State Dog.
Title
Designates Seeing Eye® dog as State Dog.
Sponsors
Rep. John DiMaio [R] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] |
Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4590 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2849
S736 (Same As) 2020-03-19 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S2849 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.415.
S736 (Same As) 2020-03-19 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S2849 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.415.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A611 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1000/611_I1.HTM |