NJ S2849 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S736
Note: Carry Foward to future A611
Note: Carry Foward to future A611
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.415.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.415.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Seeing Eye? dog as State Dog.
Title
Designates Seeing Eye? dog as State Dog.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4590 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.415. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A4590 |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2849 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.415.
S2849 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.415.
A4590 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2849
S2849 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.415.
A4590 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2849