NJ A649 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1089
Note: Carry Over of previous A3205
Note: Carry Over of previous S970
Note: Carry Over of previous A3205
Note: Carry Over of previous S970
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to pledge to ensure availability of job training or similar activities to certain Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program recipients to prevent loss of benefits.
Title
Requires State to pledge to ensure availability of job training or similar activities to certain Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program recipients to prevent loss of benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A649 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A3205 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1131 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S970 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3205 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1131 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S970 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A649 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1000/649_I1.HTM |