NJ A709 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Approved P.L.2015, c.66.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Approved P.L.2015, c.66.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires pharmacies and prescribers to notify patients about how to ensure proper and safe disposal of unused prescription drugs.
Title
Requires pharmacies and prescribers to notify patients about how to ensure proper and safe disposal of unused prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2370 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2370 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2370 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2370 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.66. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0) |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Substituted for (S2370) (3R) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Kyrillos) |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2014-12-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2370 (Same As) 2015-02-05 - Substituted by A709 (2R)