NJ S2370 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Substituted by A709 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Substituted by A709 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires pharmacies and prescribers to notify patients about how to ensure proper and safe disposal of unused prescription drugs.
Title
Requires pharmacies and prescribers to notify patients about how to ensure proper and safe disposal of unused prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Joseph Kyrillos [R] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Substituted by A709 (2R) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Kyrillos) |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Whelan) |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A709 (Same As) 2015-06-26 - Approved P.L.2015, c.66.