NJ A747 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A574
Note: Carry Over of previous A644
Note: Carry Over of previous A644
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Treasurer to organize and publish certain contract and grant data and information on State expenditure Internet website.
Title
Requires State Treasurer to organize and publish certain contract and grant data and information on State expenditure Internet website.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A747 (Carry Over) 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A644 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2778 (Same As) 2016-11-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A644 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2778 (Same As) 2016-11-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee