NJ A783 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1261
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises grades and sentencing determinations for certain controlled dangerous substances.**
Title
Revises grades and sentencing determinations for certain controlled dangerous substances.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (66-2-5) |
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Caride) |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A783 (Carry Over) 2014-12-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S211 (Same As) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S211 (Same As) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/A783 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/A1000/783_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A783 |