NJ A789 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - Substituted by S199 (SS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - Substituted by S199 (SS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits first responders from photographing persons being assisted or disclosing photographs of such persons without their consent.
Title
Prohibits first responders from photographing persons being assisted or disclosing photographs of such persons without their consent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S199 (SS) |
2012-03-05 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S199 (Same As) 2012-08-07 - Approved P.L.2012, c.28.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A789 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A1000/789_I1.HTM |