NJ S199 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-07 - Approved P.L.2012, c.28.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-07 - Approved P.L.2012, c.28.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits first responders from photographing persons being assisted or disclosing photographs of such persons without their consent.*
Title
Prohibits first responders from photographing persons being assisted or disclosing photographs of such persons without their consent.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A789 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A789 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2012, c.28. |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A789 (ACS) |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Senate Substitution (38-0) (Connors) |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A789 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - Substituted by S199 (SS)