NJ A812 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2479
Note: Carry Over of previous S115
Note: Carry Over of previous S115
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public utility from filing rate increase petition under certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits public utility from filing rate increase petition under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2479 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S115 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2722 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S115 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2722 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A812 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1000/812_I1.HTM |