NJ S115 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A812
Note: Carry Foward to future S2722
Note: Carry Over of previous S1611
Note: Carry Over of previous A413
Note: Carry Foward to future S2722
Note: Carry Over of previous S1611
Note: Carry Over of previous A413
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public utility from filing rate increase petition under certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits public utility from filing rate increase petition under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S115 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S115 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1611 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A413 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A2479 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S115 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1611 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A413 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A2479 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S115 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S0500/115_I1.HTM |