NJ AJR14 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR29
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR78
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR12
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR43
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR78
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR12
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR43
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates neon yellow as official color to raise awareness of suicide among veterans.
Title
Designates neon yellow as official color to raise awareness of suicide among veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Umba [R] | Rep. Erik Simonsen [R] | Rep. Antwan McClellan [R] | Rep. Kim Eulner [R] |
Rep. Marilyn Piperno [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR14 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR14 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR12 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SJR43 (Carry Over) 2020-06-25 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
SJR85 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR14 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR12 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SJR43 (Carry Over) 2020-06-25 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
SJR85 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/AJR14 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/AJR/14_I1.HTM |