NJ SJR85 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR29
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR78
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR12
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR43
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR78
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR12
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR43
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates neon yellow as official color to raise awareness of suicide among veterans.
Title
Designates neon yellow as official color to raise awareness of suicide among veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Durr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR85 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SJR85 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR14 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR12 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SJR43 (Carry Over) 2020-06-25 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
SJR85 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR14 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR12 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SJR43 (Carry Over) 2020-06-25 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/SJR85 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/SJR/85_I1.HTM |