NJ AJR178 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by SJR85 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by SJR85 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates August 31 of each year "Overdose Awareness Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates August 31 of each year "Overdose Awareness Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR85 (2R) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR85 (Same As) 2020-08-31 - Approved P.L.2020, JR-2.