NJ SJR85 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Approved P.L.2020, JR-2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Approved P.L.2020, JR-2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates August 31 of each year "Overdose Awareness Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates August 31 of each year "Overdose Awareness Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Sen. Michael Testa [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR178 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR178 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, JR-2. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR178 (1R) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR178 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by SJR85 (2R)