NJ AR65 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializes FAA to adopt rules prohibiting airlines from charging baggage fees to military personnel.
Title
Memorializes FAA to adopt rules prohibiting airlines from charging baggage fees to military personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR118 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/AR65 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/AR/65_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR65 |