NJ SR118 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializes USDOT to adopt rules prohibiting airlines from charging baggage fees to military personnel.*
Title
Memorializes USDOT to adopt rules prohibiting airlines from charging baggage fees to military personnel.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (Voice) |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Beach) |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR65 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Filed with Secretary of State