NJ S1188 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1054
Note: Carry Foward to future S2326
Note: Carry Over of previous S345
Note: Carry Over of previous A2379
Note: Carry Foward to future S2326
Note: Carry Over of previous S345
Note: Carry Over of previous A2379
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers within construction industry to notify employees of certain rights.
Title
Requires employers within construction industry to notify employees of certain rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1188 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S1188 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A1237 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S345 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A2379 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1188 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A1237 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S345 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A2379 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1188 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1188_I1.HTM |