NJ S2326 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2897
Note: Carry Foward to future S2758
Note: Carry Over of previous A1237
Note: Carry Over of previous S1188
Note: Carry Foward to future S2758
Note: Carry Over of previous A1237
Note: Carry Over of previous S1188
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers within construction industry to notify employees of certain rights.
Title
Requires employers within construction industry to notify employees of certain rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2326 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2326 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A1054 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A1237 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1188 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2326 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A1054 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A1237 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1188 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2326 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2500/2326_I1.HTM |