NJ S1212 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3056
Note: Carry Foward to future S1342
Note: Carry Over of previous S4096
Note: Carry Foward to future S1342
Note: Carry Over of previous S4096
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A2676
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A2676
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises permitting thresholds for certain types of development requiring CAFRA permit from DEP.
Title
Revises permitting thresholds for certain types of development requiring CAFRA permit from DEP.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A2676 |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1212 (Carry Over) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A2676
S1212 (Carry Over) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A2676
S4096 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (35-0)
A2676 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S1212 (Carry Over) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A2676
S4096 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (35-0)
A2676 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly