NJ S1251 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1495
Note: Carry Foward to future A2885
Note: Carry Over of previous S3666
Note: Carry Over of previous A1578
Note: Carry Foward to future A2885
Note: Carry Over of previous S3666
Note: Carry Over of previous A1578
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires issuance of one free copy of birth certificate to military veteran.
Title
Requires issuance of one free copy of birth certificate to military veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1251 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1251 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1024 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3666 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1578 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1251 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1024 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3666 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1578 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee