NJ A1024 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1495
Note: Carry Foward to future A2885
Note: Carry Over of previous A5178
Note: Carry Over of previous S3666
Note: Carry Foward to future A2885
Note: Carry Over of previous A5178
Note: Carry Over of previous S3666
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires issuance of one free copy of birth certificate to military veteran.
Title
Requires issuance of one free copy of birth certificate to military veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1024 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1024 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5178 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1251 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3666 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1024 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5178 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1251 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3666 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee