NJ S1588 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1926
Note: Carry Over of previous A4909
Note: Carry Over of previous A4909
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates use of automated tools in hiring decisions to minimize discrimination in employment.
Title
Regulates use of automated tools in hiring decisions to minimize discrimination in employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1926 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A4909 (Carry Over) 2023-01-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A4030 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Combined with A3854 (ACS)
A4909 (Carry Over) 2023-01-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A4030 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Combined with A3854 (ACS)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1588 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2000/1588_I1.HTM |