NJ S1594 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1144
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a public school district to provide a daily recess period for students in grades kindergarten through 5.
Title
Requires a public school district to provide a daily recess period for students in grades kindergarten through 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4044 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4044 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A4044 (2R) |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1594 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4044 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S1594 (3R)
A4044 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S1594 (3R)