NJ S1736 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S917
Note: Carry Foward to future A2326
Note: Carry Foward to future A1422
Note: Carry Over of previous S4078
Note: Carry Over of previous A6037
Note: Carry Foward to future A2326
Note: Carry Foward to future A1422
Note: Carry Over of previous S4078
Note: Carry Over of previous A6037
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Chief Administrator of MVC to enter into cooperative arrangements with foreign countries for reciprocal recognition of certain motor vehicle driver licenses.
Title
Allows Chief Administrator of MVC to enter into cooperative arrangements with foreign countries for reciprocal recognition of certain motor vehicle driver licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1736 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1736 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1736 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S4078 (Carry Over) 2019-08-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A4093 (Same As) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
A6037 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S1736 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1736 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S4078 (Carry Over) 2019-08-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A4093 (Same As) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
A6037 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1736 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1736_I1.HTM |