NJ S917 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S3001
Note: Carry Over of previous S1736
Note: Carry Over of previous A4093
Note: Carry Over of previous S1736
Note: Carry Over of previous A4093
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Chief Administrator of MVC to enter into cooperative arrangements with foreign countries for reciprocal recognition of certain motor vehicle driver licenses.
Title
Allows Chief Administrator of MVC to enter into cooperative arrangements with foreign countries for reciprocal recognition of certain motor vehicle driver licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S917 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1736 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A4093 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
A2326 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S1736 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A4093 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
A2326 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S917 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/917_I1.HTM |