NJ S190 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S272
Note: Carry Foward to future A3460
Note: Carry Over of previous S3845
Note: Carry Over of previous S3877
Note: Carry Over of previous A5371
Note: Carry Foward to future A3460
Note: Carry Over of previous S3845
Note: Carry Over of previous S3877
Note: Carry Over of previous A5371
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires federal funding to be made available to Governor's Council on Alcoholism and Drug Abuse to support Alliance to Prevent Alcoholism and Drug Abuse if needed to offset unanticipated decrease in dedicated revenues.
Title
Requires federal funding to be made available to Governor's Council on Alcoholism and Drug Abuse to support Alliance to Prevent Alcoholism and Drug Abuse if needed to offset unanticipated decrease in dedicated revenues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S190 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S190 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3845 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4795 (Same As) 2022-10-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S3877 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5371 (Carry Over) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S3505
S190 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3845 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4795 (Same As) 2022-10-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S3877 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5371 (Carry Over) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S3505
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S190 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S0500/190_I1.HTM |