NJ S1908 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1129
Note: Carry Foward to future S2047
Note: Carry Over of previous A3943
Note: Carry Over of previous S1898
Note: Carry Foward to future S2047
Note: Carry Over of previous A3943
Note: Carry Over of previous S1898
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides assistance to business accelerators and incubators and startup businesses located within those business accelerators and incubators.
Title
Provides assistance to business accelerators and incubators and startup businesses located within those business accelerators and incubators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1908 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1908 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A109 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A3943 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S1898 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1908 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A109 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A3943 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S1898 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1908 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1908_I1.HTM |