NJ S2047 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1315
Note: Carry Foward to future S126
Note: Carry Over of previous S1908
Note: Carry Over of previous A109
Note: Carry Foward to future S126
Note: Carry Over of previous S1908
Note: Carry Over of previous A109
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides assistance to business accelerators and incubators and startup businesses located within those business accelerators and incubators.
Title
Provides assistance to business accelerators and incubators and startup businesses located within those business accelerators and incubators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2047 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2047 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1129 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S1908 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A109 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S2047 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1129 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S1908 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A109 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2047 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2500/2047_I1.HTM |