NJ S2271 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.207.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.207.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a single State college may enter into a joint purchasing agreement with other contracting units.*
Title
Clarifies that a single State college may enter into a joint purchasing agreement with other contracting units.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3460 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3460 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.207. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Substituted for A3460 (1R) |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (23-0) (Whelan) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3460 (Same As) 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S2271 (1R)