NJ S242 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1446
Note: Carry Over of previous S3729
Note: Carry Over of previous A5569
Note: Carry Over of previous S3729
Note: Carry Over of previous A5569
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey American Dream Act"; appropriates $25 million to provide down payment and home repair assistance to low and moderate income first-time homebuyers.
Title
"New Jersey American Dream Act"; appropriates $25 million to provide down payment and home repair assistance to low and moderate income first-time homebuyers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S242 (Carry Over) 2021-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3729 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3661 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A5569 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S3729 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3661 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A5569 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee