NJ S1446 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S242
Note: Carry Over of previous A3661
Note: Carry Over of previous S4200
Note: Carry Over of previous A5848
Note: Carry Over of previous A3661
Note: Carry Over of previous S4200
Note: Carry Over of previous A5848
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey American Dream Act"; appropriates $25 million to provide down payment and home repair assistance to low and moderate income first-time homebuyers.
Title
"New Jersey American Dream Act"; appropriates $25 million to provide down payment and home repair assistance to low and moderate income first-time homebuyers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S242 (Carry Over) 2021-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3661 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2785 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S4200 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5848 (Carry Over) 2021-06-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3661 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2785 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S4200 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5848 (Carry Over) 2021-06-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading