NJ S2548 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2218
Note: Carry Over of previous S4080
Note: Carry Over of previous S4080
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes school district that moves its annual school election to November to submit separate proposals for additional spending for budget year and subsequent budget year.
Title
Authorizes school district that moves its annual school election to November to submit separate proposals for additional spending for budget year and subsequent budget year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2784 (Same As) 2024-06-24 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2218 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (75-1-0)
S4080 (Carry Over) 2023-12-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2218 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (75-1-0)
S4080 (Carry Over) 2023-12-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading