NJ S2566 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A4282/4150 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A4282/4150 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires long-term care facilities and hospitals to maintain minimum supply of personal protective equipment..
Title
Requires long-term care facilities and hospitals to maintain minimum supply of personal protective equipment..
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Substituted by A4282/4150 (ACS) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Diegnan) |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4282 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.135.
A4150 (Same As) 2020-09-17 - Combined with A4282 (ACS)
A4150 (Same As) 2020-09-17 - Combined with A4282 (ACS)