NJ S2631 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A3937 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A3937 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows local government water system employees to reside in all municipalities served by water system.
Title
Allows local government water system employees to reside in all municipalities served by water system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted by A3937 (1R) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (28-0) (Turner) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3937 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.231.