NJ S2673 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Substituted by A3878 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Substituted by A3878 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Banking and Insurance to establish public awareness campaign about new federally required health insurance exchange.
Title
Requires Commissioner of Banking and Insurance to establish public awareness campaign about new federally required health insurance exchange.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Substituted by A3878 (1R) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3878 (Same As) 2013-09-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2673 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2673_I1.HTM |