NJ S2814 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3520
Note: Carry Over of previous A1569
Note: Carry Over of previous A1569
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public transportation employees to complete training course on handling and responding to suspected human trafficking; requires inclusion of certain content in certain courses.
Title
Requires public transportation employees to complete training course on handling and responding to suspected human trafficking; requires inclusion of certain content in certain courses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2115 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3520 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1569 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3520 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1569 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading