NJ S3270 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.195.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.195.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Certificates of Insurance Act;" governs use of certificates of insurance; provides DOBI with enforcement authority.
Title
"Certificates of Insurance Act;" governs use of certificates of insurance; provides DOBI with enforcement authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4705 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.195. |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A4705 |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4705 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S3270