NJ S3358 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1239
Note: Carry Foward to future S771
Note: Carry Over of previous A5889
Note: Carry Foward to future S771
Note: Carry Over of previous A5889
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCA to establish standards for prisoner reentry transitional housing.
Title
Requires DCA to establish standards for prisoner reentry transitional housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3358 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3358 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2063 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5889 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S3358 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2063 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5889 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee