NJ S3622 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (43-22-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (43-22-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases value of Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant program residential tax credits to $926 million; restricts $103 million of tax credits to certain qualified residential projects and mixed use parking projects.*
Title
Increases value of Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant program residential tax credits to $926 million; restricts $103 million of tax credits to certain qualified residential projects and mixed use parking projects.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5269 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (43-22-4) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A5269 (1R) |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-5) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5269 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3622 (1R)