NJ S3622 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1371
Note: Carry Over of previous A3144
Note: Carry Over of previous A3144
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires undergraduate students to file degree plan and requires institutions of higher education and certain propriety institutions to develop pathway systems to graduation.
Title
Requires undergraduate students to file degree plan and requires institutions of higher education and certain propriety institutions to develop pathway systems to graduation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2153 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1371 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A3144 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1371 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A3144 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S3622 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S4000/3622_I1.HTM |