NJ S4000 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S593
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Debt Defeasance and Prevention Fund," appropriates $3.7 billion.
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Debt Defeasance and Prevention Fund," appropriates $3.7 billion.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substituted by A13 |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4000 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A13
A13 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.125.
A13 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.125.