NJ S593 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3052
Note: Carry Foward to future S1334
Note: Carry Over of previous S3718
Note: Carry Over of previous A4800
Note: Carry Over of previous S4000
Note: Carry Foward to future S1334
Note: Carry Over of previous S3718
Note: Carry Over of previous A4800
Note: Carry Over of previous S4000
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MVC to provide certain vehicle and licensing services in each county in State.
Title
Requires MVC to provide certain vehicle and licensing services in each county in State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S593 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S593 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S3718 (Carry Over) 2021-05-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A4800 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A647 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S4000 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A13
S593 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S3718 (Carry Over) 2021-05-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A4800 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A647 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S4000 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A13
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S593 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/593_I1.HTM |