NJ S4077 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1282
Note: Carry Foward to future S759
Note: Carry Foward to future S759
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DEP to develop and implement electric school bus program; provides for $15 million in first year and $15 million annually in subsequent two years to DEP, subject to availability, to provide grants.
Title
Requires DEP to develop and implement electric school bus program; provides for $15 million in first year and $15 million annually in subsequent two years to DEP, subject to availability, to provide grants.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-3) |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4077 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S4077 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S4077 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee