NJ S759 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4077
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Substituted by A1282 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Substituted by A1282 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DEP to develop and implement electric school bus program; provides for $15 million in first year and $15 million annually in subsequent two years to DEP, subject to availability, to provide grants.
Title
Requires DEP to develop and implement electric school bus program; provides for $15 million in first year and $15 million annually in subsequent two years to DEP, subject to availability, to provide grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Substituted by A1282 (1R) |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4077 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A1282 (Same As) 2022-08-04 - Approved P.L.2022, c.86.
A1282 (Same As) 2022-08-04 - Approved P.L.2022, c.86.