NJ S482 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1238
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.18.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.18.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain gestational carrier agreements.
Title
Authorizes certain gestational carrier agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1704 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.18. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-16-6) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted for A1704 (3R) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-10) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Vitale) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1238 (Carry Over) 2017-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A1704 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S482 (2R)
A1704 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S482 (2R)