NJ S1238 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S482
Note: Carry Over of previous S866
Note: Carry Over of previous S866
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain gestational carrier agreements.
Title
Authorizes certain gestational carrier agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-15) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Vitale) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1238 (Carry Over) 2017-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S866 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A910 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S866 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A910 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee