NJ S866 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1238
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain gestational carrier agreements.
Title
Authorizes certain gestational carrier agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2648 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2648 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2648 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (43-25-3) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Substituted for A2648 (1R) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-13) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S866 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A2648 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Substituted by S866
A2648 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Substituted by S866
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/S866 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/S1000/866_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S866 |